Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
Sponsored by
Delegates T. Morgan, Alston, Boafo, Crosby, Davis, Foley, Harris, Harrison, Kaufman, Lehman, J. Long, M. Morgan, Patterson, Solomon, Stewart, Vogel, Wilson, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing uncodified provisions of law relating to the Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington, commonly known as the "Vestry Act"; and providing for the governance of religious corporations in union with the Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0429
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-16)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporations and Associations - Protestant Episcopal Church, Diocese of Washington
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (119-16) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2024 3:13 PM
Click to return on the top page