Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Frick, Gaines, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Jackson, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McCray, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-140)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2017, on methodologies to set child care subsidy reimbursement rates in the Child Care Subsidy Program; and requiring the report to contain specified information.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0293
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-140)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - Report
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Veto sustained (0-140)
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page