Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Exemption From Off-Sale License Quota
Sponsored by
Chair, Charles County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting in Charles County a manufacturer's license holder from a license quota for a certain alcoholic beverages license.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Exemption From Off-Sale License Quota
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Exemption From Off-Sale License Quota
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
(   18-102, 18-1601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page