Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "absconding" to include leaving a facility that an individual was placed in for certain drug or alcohol treatment without the permission of a certain administrator.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0643
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services – Division of Parole and Probation – Definition of Absconding
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:36 PM
Click to return on the top page