Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, Brooks, Gaines, Gutierrez, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Morhaim, Mosby, Reznik, Stein, Sydnor, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community College Facilities Renewal Grant Program to provide State funds to community colleges for improvements, repairs, and deferred maintenance projects; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to administer the Program; requiring the Governor to annually appropriate a certain amount in a certain budget to the Commission; requiring a certain appropriation to be in addition to the appropriation for a certain other program; establishing requirements and limitations in awarding grants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0595
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {809237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {809237/1 Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Text - Chapter - Community Colleges - Facilities Renewal Grant Program - Established
(   16-320 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page