Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland, and Woods
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council by adding the Comptroller or a designee and the Legislative Auditor or a designee; requiring the Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Department of Budget and Management regarding the creation of a State Grants Ombudsperson by July 1, 2025; altering certain reporting requirements; and extending the termination date of the Council to June 30, 2028.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {863624/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations
House 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {863624/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Grant Applications and Reporting - Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council - Alterations
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2024 2/15/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/23/2024 11:03 AM
Click to return on the top page