Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute public contributions to a certain campaign finance entity established to receive public contributions for certain eligible candidates; requiring the State Board of Elections to make a certain determination regarding the balance of the Fair Campaign Financing Fund on or before a certain date in certain years; requiring in fiscal year 2023 the governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $4,000,000 to the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0415
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {125567/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {125567/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Referred Rules 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:01 AM
Click to return on the top page