Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegate Lopez
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "firearm" to include a certain unfinished frame or receiver; prohibiting a person from purchasing, receiving, selling, offering to sell, or transferring an unfinished frame or receiver; prohibiting a person from selling, offering to sell, or transferring a certain firearm; prohibiting a person from possessing a firearm on or after March 1, 2023, unless it is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a certain number in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {723121/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (50-80)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {323621/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (44-87)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {433825/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (49-83)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {383128/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-88)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-89)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {723121/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (50-80) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {323621/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (44-87) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {433825/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (49-83) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {383128/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-88) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Saab) Rejected (42-89) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873229/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
(   5-101,   5-114,   5-701 through 5-706 )
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page