Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Loyola University and The Johns Hopkins University Police Forces
Sponsored by
Delegates Oaks, Anderson, and McIntosh
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including a member of the police force of Loyola University and the police force of The Johns Hopkins University in the definition of the term "police officer" in connection with provisions of law relating to the authority to make arrests and to the Maryland Police Training Commission.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/23/2014 1/23/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page