Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract includes a clause requiring the election service provider to report to the State Administrator of Elections if any stage in the manufacturing of a component of the provider's election system occurred outside the United States or if any material change to a component in any stage in the manufacturing of an election system occurred outside the United States; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0369 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {693721/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (45-86)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {693721/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (45-86) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems - Notification and Termination of Contract
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-110 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page