Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Sponsored by
Delegates Jones, McIntosh, B. Barnes, Cullison, Ebersole, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haynes, Hettleman, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, Patterson, Pendergrass, Proctor, Queen, Sample-Hughes, Valderrama, K. Young, P. Young, Chang, Ciliberti, Jackson, A. Miller, Reznik, Sophocleus, Valentino-Smith, and Vogt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget a certain appropriation from all fund sources for the Child Care Subsidy Program each fiscal year; requiring the Governor to appropriate funds from all fund sources in the State budget to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rates to a certain amount in certain fiscal years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0379
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954262/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {954262/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Text - Chapter - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
(   1-101, 9.5-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page