Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing requirements for a minimum seating capacity of 200 and maximum seating capacity of 1,499 individuals for a BWL Community Performing Arts Facility license for alcoholic beverages in Montgomery County.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Seating Requirements MC 11–21
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page