Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - State Highways - Mowing, Maintenance, and Litter Removal PG 419-19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to meet with the County Executive of Prince George's County or a designee at least four times each year to develop, review, and coordinate mowing, maintenance, and litter removal activities for State highways in the county; requiring the Administration to provide at least once each month a schedule of planned mowing, maintenance, and litter removal activities for State highways in the county to the County Executive of Prince George's County or a designee; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Prince George's County - State Highways - Mowing, Maintenance, and Litter Removal PG 419-19
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page