Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan – State Matching Contribution – Age of Account Holder
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an account holder of the Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan to be at least 18 years old to qualify for the State matching contribution for applications filed on or after January 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0411
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan – State Matching Contribution – Age of Account Holder
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/01/2022 2/25/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan – State Matching Contribution – Age of Account Holder
House 3/03/2022 2/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2022 2/24/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2022 3/22/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Text - Chapter - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan – State Matching Contribution – Age of Account Holder
Age
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page