Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Special Order until next session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that have an imprisonment penalty of up to 90 days and do not involve serious injury or an immediate health risk; altering the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation; altering the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {892217/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures - Citations
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {892217/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/3/2021 10:11 AM
Click to return on the top page