Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Constant Yield Tax Rate - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain notice requirements relating to the intention of a county or municipal corporation to set a certain real property tax rate that exceeds the constant yield tax rate.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0543
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Constant Yield Tax Rate - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Constant Yield Tax Rate - Notice Requirements
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Referred to interim study by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:20 AM
Click to return on the top page