Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Korean American Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Watson, Chang, Allen, Atterbeary, Bagnall, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Guzzone, Hill, Kaiser, Kaufman, Kerr, Lehman, J. Lewis, McComas, Moon, Pasteur, Pruski, Qi, Smith, Taylor, Terrasa, Wu, and Ziegler
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim January 13 as Korean American Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge certain organizations to observe Korean American Day properly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0387
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Korean American Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Korean American Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Korean American Day
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Korean American Day
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:58 PM
Click to return on the top page