Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Bagnall, Brooks, Buckel, Chang, Charles, Chisholm, Crosby, Henson, Howard, Kipke, Lisanti, Luedtke, Munoz, Patterson, Saab, Valentino-Smith, Walker, Washington, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $15,000 to $20,000 the amount of certain subtraction modifications under the Maryland income tax for individuals who are at least 55 years of age for certain retirement income received as a result of the individual's military service or attributable to the individual's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0130
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0951 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023, July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Last Updated: 2/18/2022 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page