Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Rehabilitation Programs - Reporting of Critical Incidents
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to provide the address of a residential rehabilitation program to certain entities at least 14 days before issuing a certain license; requiring the administrative head of a residential rehabilitation program to report a certain critical incident to certain entities 24 hours after receiving certain notification; requiring a certain local behavioral health authority to conduct a certain assessment and evaluation within 14 days after receiving a certain report; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1060 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Rehabilitation Programs - Reporting of Critical Incidents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Residential Rehabilitation Programs - Reporting of Critical Incidents
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:37 PM
Click to return on the top page