Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Ali, Gibson, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the property tax imposed on certain dwellings in Baltimore City that are owned by certain low-income employees of Baltimore City; providing that the credit may not exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0189
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page