Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals
Sponsored by
Delegates Boafo, Amprey, Charkoudian, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Jackson, A. Johnson, Pruski, Queen, Rogers, Shetty, Toles, Turner, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing, from $5,000 to $10,000, the maximum civil penalty for the knowing failure of an employer to properly classify an individual as an employee; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, on a showing by clear and convincing evidence that a violation has occurred, to refer to the Comptroller, certain State's Attorneys, the U.S. Department of Justice, the U.S. Department of Labor, and the U.S. Department of the Treasury complaints that allege a violation of certain tax laws.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0436
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1261 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-12)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Penalties and Referrals
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703227/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Finance 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {903923/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Senate Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (30-12) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 9:00 AM
Click to return on the top page