Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each institution of higher education to provide the telephone number of Maryland's Helpline, or an on-campus crisis center that operates 24 hours a day and 365 days a year, on student identification cards, if provided by the institution; authorizing an institution of higher education to provide telephone numbers of mental health crisis hotlines on student identification cards, if provided by the institution; and providing requirements for compliance with certain provisions of the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0405
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/28/2021
Legislative Date
5/28/2021
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {704660/1 Adopted 17BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Student Identification Cards - Required Information
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/28/2021 5/28/2021 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-126 )
Last Updated: 8/2/2021 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page