Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Reciprocal Agreements
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr and Lehman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to enter into a certain agreement with another jurisdiction for the reciprocal enforcement of traffic violations recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system under certain circumstances; requiring a political subdivision to coordinate with the Administration to facilitate the reciprocal enforcement of violations recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0373 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Administration - Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Reciprocal Agreements
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/5/2022 9:36 AM
Click to return on the top page