Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, D. Jones, Allen, Crosby, Ebersole, Feldmark, Terrasa, Vogel, Williams, Wilson, Attar, Fair, Griffith, Grossman, Henson, Hornberger, Mireku-North, Roberts, Wells, Wilkins, Wims, and Wu
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the School Mapping Data Program in the Maryland Center for School Safety; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide funds to local school systems to produce school mapping data for each public school and public charter school in the county to assist first responders in responding to emergencies at a school; authorizing the use of the Safe Schools Fund to provide funding to local school systems for the program; and requiring a certain custodian of records to deny inspection of school mapping data.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0540
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {733427/1 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {733027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {523825/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Floor Amendment {733427/1 (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments {733027/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - School Mapping Data Program - Established
(   5-310.1, 7-1510.1, 7-1512   )
Last Updated: 4/4/2024 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page