Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland-Bred Race Fund Advisory Committee to include an individual who is a member of and recommended by the Maryland Thoroughbred Horsemen's Association, Inc.; altering the circumstances under which a horse may be registered with the Maryland Horse Breeders Association, Inc.; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0533
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund Advisory Committee - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {995763/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund Advisory Committee - Membership
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {995763/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Returned Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - Horse Racing - Maryland-Bred Race Fund - Advisory Committee Membership and Registration of Horses
(   11-529, 11-532, 11-538 )
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:40 PM
Click to return on the top page