Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller, for the purpose of identifying homeowners who are eligible for but have failed to claim the homeowners' property tax credit, to identify individuals who did not file an income tax return for the 3 most recent taxable years and provide the State Department of Assessments and Taxation those individuals' contact information.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text - Chapter - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Identification of Eligible Homeowners
Last Updated: 5/3/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page