Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Open Meetings Act - Application of Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Bobo
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying specified penalty provisions to a member of a public body who attends a meeting of the public body that is held in violation of the Open Meetings Act; and providing that specified penalties do not apply to specified members of public bodies under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
(   10-510, 10-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page