Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Foley and Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of State Police to make a tow list of qualified towing companies for use by the Department in carrying out police-initiated towing of disabled or abandoned commercial vehicles and to make certain rate sheets available to the public on request; and establishing certain requirements and procedures for the police-initiated towing of certain commercial vehicles at the direction of the Department.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0613
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Vehicles - Nonconsensual Towing - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633629/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-34)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703524/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-35)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Commercial Vehicles - Nonconsensual Towing - Requirements
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {633629/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (98-34) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703524/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Salling) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {703524/1 Adopted 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-35) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Text - Chapter - Commercial Vehicles - Police-Initiated Towing - Requirements
(   16A-101 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:06 PM
Click to return on the top page