Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting - Nonresident Sika Deer Stamp - Fee Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger and D. Jones
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the fee for nonresident sika deer stamps from $25 to $100.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0508
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hunting - Nonresident Sika Deer Stamp - Fee Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Hunting - Nonresident Sika Deer Stamp - Fee Alteration
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 2/23/2024 6:27 PM
Click to return on the top page