Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Theft of Benefits (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis and Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Services to reimburse a beneficiary for any benefits lost due to the fraudulent use of the beneficiary's Electronic Benefits Transfer card; requiring the State to give preference to certain vendors in the procurement process for electronic benefits distribution or administration; requiring the Department to establish a certain point of contact for investigating and identifying electronic benefits fraud; applying certain provisions of the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/02/2023
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/16/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-11)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Fraud (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
House 2/02/2023 2/02/2023 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2023 3/16/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {123225/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Human Services - Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards - Theft of Benefits (Prevent Electronic Benefits Theft Act of 2023)
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (123-11) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-609, 5-610 )
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page