Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation to the Marilyn Hatza Memorial Strengthening the Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
Sponsored by
Delegate Watson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 each year to the Department of Planning to be used as a grant to the Maryland Humanities Council for the Marilyn Hatza Memorial Strengthening Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative; and requiring the Maryland Humanities Council to select, award, and report on grants to qualifying nonprofit organizations under the SHINE Grantmaking Initiative.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0596
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-11)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation to the Marilyn Hatza Memorial Strengthening the Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {173628/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Planning - Maryland Humanities Council - Appropriation to the Marilyn Hatza Memorial Strengthening the Humanities Investment in Nonprofits for Equity (SHINE) Grantmaking Initiative
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (117-11) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page