Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Regional Transmission Organizations - Membership and Report (Utility Transparency and Accountability Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain electric company to be a member of a regional transmission organization; and requiring a certain electric company, by February 1 each year, to submit a report to the Public Service Commission regarding certain votes cast by the electric company and any of its affiliates at a meeting of the regional transmission organization.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423521/1
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {943824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Adams and Crosby)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Limitations on Cost Recovery by Public Service Companies and Reports on Votes Cast at Meetings of Regional Transmission Organizations (Utility Transparency and Accountability Act)
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {663621/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Companies - Regional Transmission Organizations - Membership and Report (Utility Transparency and Accountability Act)
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments {423521/1 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {423521/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Floor Amendment {943824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (40-5) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Adams and Crosby) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
(   1-101,   4-103,   4-504, 4-505, 5-307 )
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page