Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Revisions (Maryland Road Worker Protection Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Boyce, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Ebersole, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Henson, Hill, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaiser, Kaufman, Lopez, Martinez, McCaskill, T. Morgan, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Roberson, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Stewart, Taveras, Taylor, Turner, Valderrama, Watson, White Holland, Williams, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of revenue from civil fines collected through the use of work zone speed control systems to include certain distributions for highway and work zone safety purposes; clarifying that a work zone speed control system may be manned or unmanned and a system operator does not need to be present when a work zone speed control system is in use; altering the maximum penalty for a civil citation issued as a result of a recorded image produced by a work zone speed control system; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0479
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, January 1, 2025
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Revisions (Maryland Road Worker Protection Act of 2024)
Last Updated: 2/15/2024 8:20 PM
Click to return on the top page