Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from preventing a candidate from accessing apartment buildings to campaign for elected office, register voters, or distribute campaign material, except under certain circumstances; authorizing a person to impose certain limitations on the ability of a candidate to access an apartment building or individual dwelling unit; prohibiting a candidate from engaging with residents of an apartment building under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Real Property – Candidates – Access to Apartment Buildings
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:39 PM
Click to return on the top page