Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
Sponsored by
St. Mary's County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting applicants for employment as a paramedic or an emergency medical technician with St. Mary's County or employment with the St. Mary's County Emergency Communications Center from the prohibition on employers requiring or demanding that an individual submit to or take a polygraph examination as a condition of employment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
House 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 2/28/2022 Referred Finance 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2022 3/20/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Returned Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text - Chapter - St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Applicants - Polygraph Examinations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page