Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsored by
Delegate McKay
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Granting the Town of Williamsport in Washington County the authority to exercise urban renewal powers in areas zoned for commercial use for blight clearance and redevelopment under Article III, Section 61 of the Maryland Constitution; and authorizing the municipality to levy certain taxes and issue general obligation bonds and revenue bonds to carry out urban renewal powers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-1)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (41-1) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Text - Chapter - Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
(   A1-101 through A1-114 )
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page