Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Disparities Within and Independence From University System of Maryland - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the University System of Maryland to contract with an independent consultant to study disparities between historically black colleges and universities in the State and the University System of Maryland and their continued relationship; and requiring the University of Maryland to report to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Appropriations Committee on its findings and recommendations by December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Disparities Within and Independence From University System of Maryland - Study
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2022 12:23 PM
Click to return on the top page