Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant - Funding and Evaluation - Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate J. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending through fiscal year 2028 the requirement that the Governor include a certain amount in the State budget for increasing the number of green schools in the State; and extending through calendar year 2029 the annual evaluation of the impact of the funds appropriated under the Act on increasing the number of green schools in the State.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0383
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-6)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant - Funding and Evaluation - Extension
House 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Association of Environmental and Outdoor Education Grant - Funding and Evaluation - Extension
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-6) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page