Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services – Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment – Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegates Embry, Allen, Boafo, Boyce, Crutchfield, A. Johnson, McCaskill, Mireku-North, Palakovich Carr, Taylor, Terrasa, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement for the Maryland Parole Commission to assess a fee against an individual on parole and supervised by the Division of Parole and Probation under certain circumstances; and repealing authorization for the Division of Parole and Probation to require a supervisee of the Division who is on parole to pay for certain drug or alcohol abuse testing under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-26)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-8)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services – Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment – Repeal
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Services – Parole Supervision Fees and Drug and Alcohol Abuse Test Payment – Repeal
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (107-26) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (39-8) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 11:48 AM
Click to return on the top page