Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Flanagan, Kittleman, McComas, A. Miller, and W. Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to erect an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque at each railroad grade crossing in the State that is no longer in use by a railroad; specifying that the design and placement of a plaque shall be erected in accordance with the federal Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices; and exempting specified vehicles from the requirement to stop at specified railroad grade crossings if the railroad grade crossing has an exempt highway-rail grade crossing plaque.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0098
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1120 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text - Chapter - Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
(   21-703, 8-644 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page