Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the School Site Council Pilot Program in Montgomery County to hold schools accountable for the investment of tax dollars in schools by federal, State, and local entities; requiring each public school in Montgomery County to establish a school site council; requiring each public school in Montgomery County to create a School Plan for Student Achievement; providing for the purpose and content of the Plan; requiring a school site council to conduct a certain needs assessment and a certain process before developing the Plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2021
Legislative Date
1/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Montgomery County - Education - School Site Council Pilot Program MC 21-21
House 1/23/2021 1/23/2021 Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-501 through 4-505 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:03 PM
Click to return on the top page