Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the method for calculating family income to be used to consider free or reduced-cost medical care under a certain hospital financial assistance policy; requiring that the description of a hospital's financial assistance policy include a section that allows a patient to indicate the patient is aware of the policy; prohibiting a hospital from charging interest or fees on certain debts incurred by patients; requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to develop guidelines for an income-based payment plan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0514
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {266285/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {266285/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 12:37 PM
Click to return on the top page