Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Intestate Succession - Share of Surviving Spouse and Order of Distribution
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the share of the intestate estate of a decedent inherited by a surviving spouse under certain circumstances; altering, for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the distribution of the net estate or residue of the net estate, the order of distribution to certain individuals; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Intestate Succession - Share of Surviving Spouse and Order of Distribution
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-102, 3-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page