Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Baby Bond Account Program in the Office of the State Treasurer; establishing the Baby Bond Account Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund is to provide money to eligible individuals to address wealth disparities in the State; establishing the Baby Bond Account Board; requiring the Governor to appropriate $70,000,000 to the Fund for fiscal year 2023; requiring the State Treasurer to establish and make certain deposits into certain accounts for eligible individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-1301 through 8-1310 )
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:40 PM
Click to return on the top page