Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
Sponsored by
Delegates Morales, Anderson, Angel, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Korman, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Rosenberg, Tarlau, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "licensed health care practitioner" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing vital statistics and records to include a registered nurse certified as a certified nurse midwife under Title 8 of the Health Occupations Article, a licensed clinical professional counselor licensed under Title 17 of the Health Occupations Article, or a physician assistant licensed under Title 15 of the Health Occupations Article.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {636485/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-43)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Vital Statistics and Records - Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner - Physician Assistant
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments {636485/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page