Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Time to Serve Act of 2024
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Allen, Amprey, Anderton, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Boafo, Bouchat, Boyce, Buckel, Charkoudian, Conaway, Crutchfield, Edelson, Fennell, Foley, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Griffith, Grossman, Guyton, Guzzone, Harris, Henson, Hill, Holmes, Hornberger, Ivey, Jackson, A. Johnson, S. Johnson, D. Jones, Kaufman, Kipke, J. Long, Lopez, Love, McCaskill, Mireku-North, T. Morgan, Munoz, Palakovich Carr, Pasteur, Patterson, Phillips, Pruski, Roberson, Roberts, Rogers, Ruff, Ruth, Simmons, Simpson, Solomon, Spiegel, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Tomlinson, Turner, Valderrama, White Holland, and Williams
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of disaster service leave for employees in the Executive Branch of State government; and increasing, from 15 to 30, the maximum number of days of paid leave the Secretary of Budget and Management may provide for uniformed services training or active uniformed services duty in a reserve unit of the armed forces or organized militia.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0477
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Time to Serve Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-3)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Time to Serve Act of 2024
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/20/2024 2/20/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Time to Serve Act of 2024
House 2/22/2024 2/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-3) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2024 10:25 AM
Click to return on the top page