Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Boafo, Allen, Crutchfield, Feldmark, Fennell, Guyton, Harris, Holmes, A. Johnson, D. Jones, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Pruski, Rogers, Shetty, Taveras, Taylor, Toles, Vogel, Wells, White Holland, Williams, Wolek, Woods, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting discrimination based on military status with regard to housing and employment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {233428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
House 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {233428/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Discrimination - Military Status - Prohibition
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page