Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Hiring and Promotion Plan - Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Gilchrist, Luedtke, Ruth, Sample-Hughes, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with the Natural Resources Police Force, to develop, implement, and adhere to a hiring and promotion plan to transition the composition of the Natural Resources Police Force to reflect the demographics of the State; prohibiting the Department from initiating or continuing any promotion process for the Natural Resources Police Force before the plan is published; requiring the plan be completed and published by October 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Natural Resources Police Force - Hiring and Promotion Plan - Requirement
House 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page