Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Holmes, and Vallario
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified conditions of eligibility for funding from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account by specifying minimum amounts to be spent on capital maintenance and expenditures by specified race tracks; authorizing the Maryland Racing Commission to grant a one-time request for capital improvement funds not to exceed $150,000 from the funds available in the Account for a capital improvement project at the Bowie Race Course Training Center under specified conditions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0178
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695266/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Horse Racing - Bowie Race Course Training Center - State Purchase or Condemnation
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {695266/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page