Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain gas and electric utilities to adopt a limited-income mechanism to benefit certain eligible limited-income customers, subject to the approval of the Public Service Commission; expanding the electric universal service program to customers who are at least 67 years old with annual incomes at or below 200% of the federal poverty level; establishing a Workgroup on Low-Income Utility Assistance to examine the forms of federal, State, local, and private assistance available to low-income residential energy customers; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0392
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {633097/1 Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {633097/1 Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {617676/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electricity and Gas - Limited-Income Mechanisms and Assistance
Age
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page